|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 11/06/1938 | 15/06/1938 | 5 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/12/1938 | 16/02/1939 | 57 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/03/1939 | 30/03/1939 | 13 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/03/1940 | 11/05/1940 | 58 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/09/1941 | 23/10/1941 | 49 days | General | Side skirting removed |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/06/1943 | 07/08/1943 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 8951 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/01/1945 | 10/02/1945 | 39 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/02/1945 | 21/02/1945 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/09/1946 | 26/10/1946 | 33 days | General | Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/03/1947 | 29/03/1947 | 11 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/08/1947 | 10/10/1947 | 52 days | General | Rebuilt to class A4/1 |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/08/1948 | 01/10/1948 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 29296 (Diagram 107) Renumbered to BR 60020 |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/03/1950 | 28/04/1950 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 29298 (Diagram 107) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
Gateshead Works | 11/12/1950 | 19/12/1950 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/10/1951 | 30/11/1951 | 39 days | Heavy Intermediate | Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/03/1953 | 22/04/1953 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 29320 (Diagram 107) Long guard irons removed |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/06/1954 | 30/07/1954 | 33 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/09/1954 | 25/09/1954 | 25 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/08/1955 | 25/08/1955 | 15 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/09/1955 | 11/10/1955 | 29 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/04/1956 | 18/05/1956 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 29277 (Diagram 107) To 75% Cut-off |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/10/1957 | 07/11/1957 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 29273 (Diagram 107) Double Chimney fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/10/1958 | 06/11/1958 | 11 days | Unclassified | BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/07/1959 | 25/08/1959 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 27960 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/04/1961 | 19/05/1961 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 29273 (Diagram 107) Speedometer fitted |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
01/10/1948 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives under repair here on 1/10 included Nos. 8, 37, 87, 98, 516/19, 1092, 1107/09/12/24, 60007/18/19/20/60, 60635 an 61120. | SLS/194811 |
31/03/1950 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives entering Works during March: These included Nos. 60020/43/54, 60133/41, 60512/39, 60820/65/67, 61083, 61634, 61822/24/61, 61947/85, 67713/24, 69444, 69505. A considerable number of 'Pacific' and 'V.2' Class locomotives are being fitted with A.T.C. gear, as part of the ex-G.N. main line has already been equipped with A.T.C. apparatus; this may be extended. | SLS/195005 |
30/04/1950 | Doncaster Works | Class A.1 named include 60120 Kittiwake, 60133 Pommern, 60141 Abbotsford in, April; other engines through Doncaster Plant included A.1 60122; A.2 60500/12/39; A.3 60039/43/54/94; A.4 60018/20/1/3; V.2 60814/20/32/65/67/80/97, 60912/14; K.3 61802/22/24/46/61/67/77, 61947/69/85; B.17 61634; C.12 67366; K.5 61863 (light repair); B.1 61036/83/95, 61113, 61267. Some exchanges of 'Pacifics' and 'Green Arrows' are afoot on account of A.T.C. trials on the G.N. Section. | SLS/195006 |
11/08/1959 | Doncaster Works (Crimpsall shops-No. 4 Bay) | Paint shop- D223, D2066, D2265, D3060, 60075/511, 61825, 73010/165; Weigh-house- D224, D2065, 60006, 61211, 62054, 63934; New Erecting shop- D2067/8/9, E5010-4, D3070, D3137/49, D3230/2/3I; Crimpsall shops-No. 2 Bay- 12113, 13254, D3072, 61185, 61809/62/73/903/27, 63930/48, 68904/65; Crimpsall shops-No. 4 Bay- 60016/20/77/90/4/129/50/536; 61210, 62057 an 63957 on south side with Service loco 4; Stripping-60038/82, 61813/39, 63965, 70000, 73163/6. Awaiting cut up- 61661, 64181/258, 68973, 69515/7/45/8/76/84; Being cut up-60700, 61627, 64246, 69536/9. For condition reports- 61623, 68974, 69526/41/91. In yard D3229 an 11160. | SLS/195909 |
23/04/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D2390/1, D3452, E3056/61-5. Stripping Road: D2402, D3152, D3487, 60033/8/9/64/83/8/95/8, 61814/49, 62049, 68945/90, 70010/35. Scrap Road: 64208/23/36, 64804/74/82, 68903/16/27/70/81, Crimpsall: 43149, 61384, 70001. Outside Crimpsall: DEPT7, 60143, 70053, 73012. Erecting Shop: D3445/89, D5573, D8217, 13252, 13326, 43126/44, 60020/40/63/8/75/90, 60126, 60520/8, 61162, 61205/11, 61363, 61897, 62025/42/60, 63985. Outside Erecting Shop: 60015, 61927, 62011. Paint Shop: D341, D2389, D5695, E3059/60, 60047/67, 60141, 60536, 61094, 73065. Works Shunters: DEPT10, DEPT11. | SLS/196106 |
25/04/1964 | Darlington Works (Shed Waiting Works) | Erecting Shop: D12, D25, D28, D181, D186, Dep. 84, D2078, D2605, D3140, D3455, D3656, D5106, D5155, D7591 painted, D7593 motors mounted, D7594, D7595 equipment fitted, D7596 body, 60124, 60133, 61016, 61256, 61289, 61388, 62065, 62067, 65882, 73004, 73071, 75056, 90047. Stripping Shop (Inside): 61306, 43033; Stripping Shop (Outside): 60011, 60864. Paint Shop (Inside): D182; Paint Shop (Outside): 75006 painted green. Level Crossing: D30, D3378 ex works, D3675, D7592 painted. Works Yard: D2700, D5166, D7597 body, 60973, 63399, 62057 frame, 65033, 65099, 73142 ex works, 90370 ex works. Works Shunter: 68037. Test House: Empty. North Road Scrap Yard: 63388, 65876. Shed (Waiting Works): 60020, 65880, 69020 Stored, 61304, 61321, 68046, 68051, 68054. | SLS/196406 |
04/07/1964 | Darlington Works (Works Yard) | Erecting Shop: D32, D171/6/7/74/8, D5096, D5112/67, D7596/7, DEPT84, D2242/64, D2605, D3151, 60024, 61386, 62062, 65880, 73026/35, 75059/62, 90056/230/43/429/704, 90061. Stripping Shop: 43005, 60836/55, 61030, 63345/70, 90011. Paint Shop: D3675, 75017. Level Crossing: D25, D27, D169, D187. Works Yard: D170/80/9/91, D2163, D2700, 60011/20/527/844/910, 61038, 62002/41, 63460, 65053/99, 73133/55, 90233. Waiting Works: D2586, 60916, 61037, 63383, 63415/22/39, 69003/11/9/20, 90511. Ex Works. 43010/33. Stored: 68016/46/51/4. | SLS/196408 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
25/12/1937 | Tender | Tender fitted: Streamlined Non-Corridor number 5669 | ||
08/01/1938 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4465, name: GUILLEMOT Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1867 Allocated to Gateshead (GHD) Livery applied: Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. Diagram 107 boiler fitted |
||
11/06/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/06/1938. Dep: 15/06/1938. | ||
22/12/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/12/1938. Dep: 16/02/1939. | ||
18/03/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/03/1939. Dep: 30/03/1939. | ||
15/03/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1940. Dep: 11/05/1940. | ||
05/09/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1941. Dep: 23/10/1941. Work undertaken: Side skirting removed |
||
21/06/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1943. Dep: 07/08/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8951 (Diagram 107) |
||
17/08/1943 | Livery | Change of livery to Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender | ||
30/11/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
03/01/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/01/1945. Dep: 10/02/1945. | ||
15/02/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/02/1945. Dep: 21/02/1945. | ||
01/10/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 604 but not taken up | ||
15/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 20 | ||
24/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1946. Dep: 26/10/1946. Work undertaken: Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. |
||
26/10/1946 | Livery | Change of livery to Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. | ||
19/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/03/1947. Dep: 29/03/1947. | ||
20/08/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1947. Dep: 10/10/1947. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class A4/1 |
||
11/08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1948. Dep: 01/10/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29296 (Diagram 107) Renumbered to BR 60020 |
||
18/03/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/03/1950. Dep: 28/04/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29298 (Diagram 107) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
11/12/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/12/1950. Dep: 19/12/1950. | ||
23/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 23/10/1951. Dep: 30/11/1951. Work undertaken: Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
16/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1953. Dep: 22/04/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29320 (Diagram 107) Long guard irons removed |
||
28/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 28/06/1954. Dep: 30/07/1954. | ||
01/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/09/1954. Dep: 25/09/1954. | ||
11/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/08/1955. Dep: 25/08/1955. | ||
13/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/09/1955. Dep: 11/10/1955. | ||
06/04/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1956. Dep: 18/05/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29277 (Diagram 107) To 75% Cut-off |
||
08/06/1957 | Report | Report: On June 8, "A4" No. 60020 (52A) was seen piloting Fort William "Kl" No. 62011 out of Neville Hill yard on a freight. (Trains Illustrated - August, 1957) | ||
01/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1957. Dep: 07/11/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29273 (Diagram 107) Double Chimney fitted |
||
27/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/10/1958. Dep: 06/11/1958. Work undertaken: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
13/07/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1959. Dep: 25/08/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27960 (Diagram 107) |
||
07/04/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1961. Dep: 19/05/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29273 (Diagram 107) Speedometer fitted |
||
20/03/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60020 from Gateshead (52A) | ||
29/04/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |