|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 13/07/1949 | 25/08/1949 | 44 days | General | Painted Green with orange and black lining. Renumbered to BR 60525 |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/06/1951 | 27/07/1951 | 38 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 18/04/1952 | 19/04/1952 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/02/1953 | 20/03/1953 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 29849 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/11/1953 | 05/12/1953 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/10/1954 | 02/11/1954 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 29840 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/03/1956 | 11/04/1956 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 29834 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/06/1956 | 21/06/1956 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/03/1957 | 24/04/1957 | 30 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/02/1958 | 25/03/1958 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29777 (Diagram 117) |
||
Inverurie Works | 07/05/1959 | 14/05/1959 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/08/1959 | 23/09/1959 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 29816 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/09/1959 | 30/09/1959 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/04/1961 | 07/06/1961 | 45 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/09/1961 | 30/11/1961 | 63 days | General | Boiler number 29826 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/01/1963 | 27/02/1963 | 30 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/05/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shops) | New Erecting Shop: D2392-4, D3489, E3062-7. Boiler Shop: E3068-70. Stripping Road: D2402, 60007/73, 60119/61, 61327, 61844/93, 61904/85/97, 62059, 63967, 70023. Scrap Road: 63947/58, 64970, 68916/29, 69561 all intact, with 63952 just cut up. Crimpsall: 70027, 73016. Outside Crimpsall: DEPT7, 60065. Erecting Shops: D2026, D2234, D3129/52, D3445, D5534/71, 12124, 13252, 13325, 43088, 43152/5, 60013/24/33/88/99, 60525, 61095, 61190, 61249, 61300/70, 61832, 62051, 63963, 70001/5/35. Outside Erecting Shops: 60017, 61845. Outside Weigh House: 43091, 60137, 62047. Paint Shop: D2390/1, D5698, D6715, D8215, D9004/5, E3056/61, 60038/9, 61122/88, 63938, 76031. Outside Paint Shop: D345/6. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196107 |
01/10/1961 | Doncaster Works (Stripping Road) | New Erecting Shop: D2399, E3067-73. Outside New Erecting Shop: 13251. Stripping Road: 43159, 60055/64/71/89, 60162, 60525, 61207/27, 61808/88, 61920, 63973, 68894, 73000, 73170. Scrap Yard-intact: 68950, 69533/85/92. Scrap Yard-being cut up: 60035/79, 61833, 64779. Crimpsal: D3447, 43062, 60080, 61361. Outside Crimpsal: D3478, 60017, 60106, 63969, 70000. Erecting Shop: D3254, D4061, D5578, D5602, D5805, 13166, 13333, 43158, 60012/33, 60050/91/2, 60128/59, 60511/3/37, 61145, 61299, 61867, 62006, 63965/80, 70035/8. Outside Erecting Shop: 61897, 70030, 73169. Weigh House : Nil. Outside Weigh House: 61075. Paint Shop: D5050, D5583, D9014, E3066, 60001, 61248. Outside Paint Shop: D5355, D5604, D5816. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196111 |
29/10/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D3254, E3069-74. Stripping Road: D5802, 43151, 60003, 60108, 63936/60/81, 73000. Crimpsal: 60046, 60127. Outside Crimpsal: 61107, 63969, 70008/44. Scrap Yard: 60055, 61866, 64646, 65450/78 intact, 61979 being cut up. Boiler Park: 60025, 63980. Erecting Shop: D2021, D3153, D3447/8/76-8, D3646, D5520/83, D5600/6/9/66, D5805, D9004, 13166, 60021/65/89, 60162, 60525/38, 61003/89, 61143/62, 61389, 63927/73, 70000/13. Weigh House: D9016. Outside Weigh House: 60071/80. Paint Shop: D364, D5050/4, D5358, D5820, E3067/8, 43159, 61207, 61367. Paint Shop Yard : Nil. Works Shunters: Dpt10/1. | SLS/196112 |
12/11/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: 13166, D8239, E3069-75; Outside New Erecting Shop: D5583, 61042, 61317, 73000/165. Stripping Road: 60015, 63973/87, 70041. Crimpsal: D3646. 43151, 60108; Outside Crimpsall: 60003/29/149, 73024 (89A). Erecting Shop: D3153, D3447/8, D3476-8, D5520, D5609/37/66, D5802, 43160, 60023/65/127/525, 70000/8, 73054; Outside Erecting Shop: 60154, 76045. Weigh House: D366; Outside Weigh House: 61389. Paint Shop: E3068, D3254, D5050, D5360, D5606, D5822 (Brush 323/61), D9017 (EE2922, V574 of 1961), 60021/162, 62037, 63980, 70013. Works Shunters: Dpt10/1. | SLS/196112 |
10/01/1962 | Doncaster MPD | Ex-Works on Doncaster (36A) Shed: D3447, D5823 (new), 43160, 60525, 62007, 63969, 70000. | SLS/196201 |
14/04/1963 | St. Rollox MPD | in steam-60004/31/94, 60955 and 60525 under repair, and stored-42877, 45119, 45718/28/9/31; ex Works-44931, 45309 an 45478. | SLS/196304 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
24/12/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 525, name: A.H. PEPPERCORN Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 2016 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Diagram 118 boiler fitted |
||
12/12/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
18/12/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
13/07/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1949. Dep: 25/08/1949. Work undertaken: Painted Green with orange and black lining. Renumbered to BR 60525 |
||
28/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) | ||
03/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD) | ||
20/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 20/06/1951. Dep: 27/07/1951. | ||
18/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/04/1952. Dep: 19/04/1952. | ||
18/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1953. Dep: 20/03/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29849 (Diagram 118) |
||
25/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/11/1953. Dep: 05/12/1953. | ||
04/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/10/1954. Dep: 02/11/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29840 (Diagram 118) |
||
03/03/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1956. Dep: 11/04/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29834 (Diagram 118) |
||
11/06/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/06/1956. Dep: 21/06/1956. | ||
26/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/03/1957. Dep: 24/04/1957. | ||
21/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1958. Dep: 25/03/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29777 (Diagram 117) |
||
07/05/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/05/1959. Dep: 14/05/1959. | ||
19/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/08/1959. Dep: 23/09/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29816 (Diagram 118) |
||
28/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/09/1959. Dep: 30/09/1959. | ||
24/04/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/04/1961. Dep: 07/06/1961. | ||
29/09/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1961. Dep: 30/11/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29826 (Diagram 118) |
||
29/01/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/01/1963. Dep: 27/02/1963. | ||
27/03/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60525 from Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) | ||
14/04/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |