|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 11/08/1949 | 28/09/1949 | 49 days | General | Multi-valve regulator & double chimney fitted Double Chimney fitted Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/02/1951 | 04/04/1951 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 29830 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/04/1951 | 17/04/1951 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/08/1951 | 06/09/1951 | 24 days | Light Casual | After derailment |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/06/1952 | 23/07/1952 | 43 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 28/01/1953 | 29/01/1953 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/11/1953 | 19/12/1953 | 31 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/03/1955 | 22/04/1955 | 38 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/07/1955 | 26/07/1955 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/02/1956 | 15/02/1956 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/03/1956 | 04/04/1956 | 15 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/01/1957 | 01/03/1957 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29801 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/07/1958 | 28/08/1958 | 36 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/12/1959 | 04/02/1960 | 38 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/08/1960 | 24/09/1960 | 46 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/12/1960 | 05/01/1961 | 23 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/03/1961 | 15/04/1961 | 37 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 01/12/1961 | 14/12/1961 | 14 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/06/1962 | 26/07/1962 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 29871 (Diagram 118) |
||
Inverurie Works | 14/04/1964 | 15/04/1964 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 04/02/1965 | 18/05/1965 | 104 days | Light Intermediate |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/03/1948 | Doncaster Works | Nos. 22, 23, 27, 34, 79, 91, 103, 504, 511/2/4 were all in Doncaster Plant about the beginning of March, but not all were in for general repair. Owing to a defective cylinder and piston, 'C.1' No. 2808 has been condemned, the boiler of which has now been placed on No. 2877. New 'A.2' No. 60532 Blue Peter was ready towards the end of March. The first re-numbered engines (green) ex Doncaster were: Nos. 60079, 60066 (after Goswick crash), 60512, 61070 an 60982, while others in hand included Nos. 60007/23 an 61828. No. 60534 will soon be ready, completing E.O. 380. Order 381 is for five 'A.2' following on. It is understood Orders 382-3 will be for 16 new 'A.1' 4-6-2's. | SLS/194805 |
19/12/1960 | Doncaster Works (Stripping Road) | New Erecting Shop: E3057-63, D3329, 12125, and frames for three new diesel shunters. Stripping Road: 60113, 60507/10/32, 61083, 61141/51, 73074. Scrap Road: 61771, 62666, 63950/3, 641S2,48875 68943/7, 69293, 69581. Erecting Shop: 43148, 60004/15/25/74/86, 60109, 60539, 61044, 61177, 61314, 61807, 73097, D3475/86, D8020. Erecting Shop Yard: 60058/66, 60144/5, 61266/85, 63923, D3487. Crimpsall Yard: 63944, 68911/4. Paint Shop: 60006, 60531. 61279, 61366, 61862, 62022/56, 63935, D312, D2113, D2207, D5675-7, E3056. | SLS/196102 |
19/03/1961 | Doncaster Works (Outside Crimpsall) | New Erecting Shop: D2388/9, E3059-64. Stripping Road: D2402, D3489, 13252, 60040, 61144, 61227, 61828, 62013, 63954, 68522, 68869/90, 68916, 69572; Scrap Yard: 64729/87, with 64746, 68875, 68979, 69586 being cut-up. Crimpsall: 60047/90, 61066, 62061. Outside Crimpsall: 60026, 60532, 61971. Erecting Shop: 13326, D3452, D5564, D8214, D9002, 43092, 43151, 60014/28/53/8, 60102/33/8, 61066/73, 61819/32/43/89, 61939, 62009, 63949/68, 70039, 76032. Outside Erecting Shop: D2400, 60128, 68925. Weigh House: D336. Outside Weigh House: 61950. Paint Shop: D320/37, D2387, D5690/1, D6712, D9000, E3058, 60041, 60118/36, 60529, 61835, 73096. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196105 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
25/03/1948 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 60532, name: BLUE PETER Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 2023 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Diagram 118 boiler fitted |
||
11/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1949. Dep: 28/09/1949. Work undertaken: Multi-valve regulator & double chimney fitted Double Chimney fitted Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
27/11/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) | ||
03/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY) | ||
07/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) | ||
31/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) | ||
28/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1951. Dep: 04/04/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29830 (Diagram 118) |
||
12/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/04/1951. Dep: 17/04/1951. | ||
14/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/08/1951. Dep: 06/09/1951. Work undertaken: After derailment |
||
11/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 11/06/1952. Dep: 23/07/1952. | ||
28/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/01/1953. Dep: 29/01/1953. | ||
19/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1953. Dep: 19/12/1953. | ||
16/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1955. Dep: 22/04/1955. | ||
19/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/07/1955. Dep: 26/07/1955. | ||
08/02/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/02/1956. Dep: 15/02/1956. | ||
21/03/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/03/1956. Dep: 04/04/1956. | ||
28/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1957. Dep: 01/03/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29801 (Diagram 118) |
||
24/07/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 24/07/1958. Dep: 28/08/1958. | ||
29/12/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 29/12/1959. Dep: 04/02/1960. | ||
10/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/08/1960. Dep: 24/09/1960. | ||
14/12/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/12/1960. Dep: 05/01/1961. | ||
10/03/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/03/1961. Dep: 15/04/1961. | ||
19/06/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) | ||
01/12/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/12/1961. Dep: 14/12/1961. | ||
06/06/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1962. Dep: 26/07/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29871 (Diagram 118) |
||
14/04/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/04/1964. Dep: 15/04/1964. | ||
04/02/1965 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 04/02/1965. Dep: 18/05/1965. | ||
04/12/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) | ||
31/12/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60532 from Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) |