Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 90 Today
» 1085 Yesterday
» 6146 Week
» 20723 Month
» 383968 Year
» 460555 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1946) 1034   03/10/1947
BR 61034   22/08/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
03/10/1947 CHIRU

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Thompson
Class B1
Company History LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 2014
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service Mon 03/10/1947 to York (North) (YK)
Withdrawal Mon 21/12/1964 off Wakefield (56A)
Scrapping During 02/1965 at Drapers (Hull)
Service Life 17 yrs, 2 mths , 18 dys

Notes
Notes Sold 2/65 for scrap to A Draper, Hull

Allocations
Code Name From Date
YK York (North) (New) 03/10/1947
NEV Neville Hill 29/11/1947
SKN Stockton 06/02/1949
51L Thornaby 14/06/1959
56B Ardsley 25/11/1962
56A Wakefield 05/01/1964
   Withdrawn 21/12/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW YK York (North) 03/10/1947
ALLOC NEV Neville Hill w/e 29/11/1947
ALLOC SKN Stockton w/e 12/02/1949
ALLOC 51L Thornaby 14/06/1959
ALLOC 56B Ardsley 3w/e 24/11/1962
ALLOC 56A Wakefield 5w/e 11/01/1964
WDN   21/12/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/10/1947 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 3599)
22/08/1949 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 9836)
27/06/1951 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28220)
01/09/1953 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28216)
11/01/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28168)
14/12/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28315)
27/05/1959 Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
25/01/1961 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28398)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 12/07/1949 22/08/1949 42 days General
Boiler number 9836 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 61034
 
Darlington Works 01/06/1951 27/06/1951 27 days General
Boiler number 28220 (Diagram 100A)
 
Darlington Works 12/08/1953 01/09/1953 21 days General
Boiler number 28216 (Diagram 100A)
 
Darlington Works 12/12/1955 11/01/1956 31 days General
Boiler number 28168 (Diagram 100A)
 
Darlington Works 18/11/1957 14/12/1957 27 days General
Boiler number 28315 (Diagram 100A)
 
Darlington Works 16/12/1957 17/12/1957 2 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 11/05/1959 27/05/1959 17 days Unclassified
Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
 
Darlington Works 10/07/1959 06/10/1959 89 days Heavy Casual
After collision
 
Darlington Works 07/01/1960 25/01/1961 385 days General
Boiler number 28398 (Diagram 100A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/10/1947 To Service To service as LNER Number 1034, name: CHIRU
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2014
Allocated to York (North) (YK)
Diagram 100A boiler fitted
   
29/11/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV)    
06/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Stockton (SKN)    
12/07/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/07/1949. Dep: 22/08/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9836 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 61034
   
01/06/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1951. Dep: 27/06/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28220 (Diagram 100A)
   
12/08/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1953. Dep: 01/09/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28216 (Diagram 100A)
   
12/12/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1955. Dep: 11/01/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28168 (Diagram 100A)
   
18/11/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/11/1957. Dep: 14/12/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28315 (Diagram 100A)
   
16/12/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/12/1957. Dep: 17/12/1957.    
11/05/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/05/1959. Dep: 27/05/1959.
Work undertaken:
Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
   
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
10/07/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 10/07/1959. Dep: 06/10/1959.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
07/01/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/01/1960. Dep: 25/01/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28398 (Diagram 100A)
   
25/11/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (56B)    
05/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (56A)    
21/12/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 61034 from Wakefield (56A)    
02/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev