|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stratford Works | 21/03/1948 | 22/04/1948 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 5066 (Diagram 100A) Front end heater connection fitted Renumbered to BR 61043 |
||
Stratford Works | 25/09/1949 | 29/10/1949 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 28505 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 22/01/1950 | 03/02/1950 | 13 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 06/07/1950 | 24/11/1950 | 142 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 12/07/1951 | 25/08/1951 | 45 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 11/01/1952 | 26/02/1952 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 28577 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 13/10/1953 | 21/11/1953 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 28514 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 20/09/1955 | 29/10/1955 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 28541 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 16/09/1957 | 19/10/1957 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 28530 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 21/10/1959 | 31/12/1959 | 72 days | General | Boiler number 28256 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/07/1962 | 04/07/1962 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
14/05/1946 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1043 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25800 Allocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
21/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 21/03/1948. Dep: 22/04/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5066 (Diagram 100A) Front end heater connection fitted Renumbered to BR 61043 |
||
25/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 25/09/1949. Dep: 29/10/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28505 (Diagram 100A) |
||
22/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/01/1950. Dep: 03/02/1950. | ||
06/07/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 06/07/1950. Dep: 24/11/1950. | ||
12/07/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/07/1951. Dep: 25/08/1951. | ||
11/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1952. Dep: 26/02/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28577 (Diagram 100A) |
||
13/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1953. Dep: 21/11/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28514 (Diagram 100A) |
||
20/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1955. Dep: 29/10/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28541 (Diagram 100A) |
||
16/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 16/09/1957. Dep: 19/10/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28530 (Diagram 100A) |
||
21/10/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 21/10/1959. Dep: 31/12/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28256 (Diagram 100A) |
||
04/02/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
07/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster | ||
04/07/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 04/07/1962. Dep: 04/07/1962. | ||
09/07/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61043 from March (31B) |