|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 18/05/1907 | 13/07/1907 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 342 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/02/1913 | 05/04/1913 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 340 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/05/1920 | 13/03/1920 | -71 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 03/09/1921 | 26/11/1921 | 85 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 24/03/1923 | 14/07/1923 | 113 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 29/08/1925 | 09/01/1926 | 134 days | General | Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number 642 (Diagram 17Sup) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6068 |
||
Gorton Works | 29/10/1927 | 24/12/1927 | 57 days | General | New right hand cylinder fitted |
||
Gorton Works | 03/05/1930 | 14/06/1930 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 407 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/12/1930 | 23/01/1932 | 401 days | General | Boiler number 642 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/12/1933 | 23/12/1933 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 833 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/06/1935 | 06/07/1935 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1912 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/08/1937 | 02/10/1937 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 333 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/12/1938 | 24/12/1938 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 25/05/1940 | 08/06/1940 | 15 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 02/06/1943 | 26/06/1943 | 25 days | General | New left hand cylinder fitted Boiler number 138 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/01/1946 | 02/02/1946 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 722 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/09/1947 | 27/09/1947 | 15 days | Light Repair | After collision |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1902 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 1068 Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 6236 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted |
||
18/05/1907 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1907. Dep: 13/07/1907. Work undertaken: Boiler number 342 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
15/02/1913 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/02/1913. Dep: 05/04/1913. Work undertaken: Boiler number 340 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
19/01/1917 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
13/03/1920 | Modification | Diagram 17Sat number 1842 boiler fitted | ||
24/05/1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1920. Dep: 13/03/1920. | ||
03/09/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1921. Dep: 26/11/1921. | ||
24/03/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1923. Dep: 14/07/1923. | ||
05/01/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
22/05/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
29/08/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1925. Dep: 09/01/1926. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number 642 (Diagram 17Sup) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6068 |
||
22/02/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) | ||
27/04/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
26/07/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
29/10/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1927. Dep: 24/12/1927. Work undertaken: New right hand cylinder fitted |
||
14/07/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
03/05/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1930. Dep: 14/06/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 407 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
19/12/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/12/1930. Dep: 23/01/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 642 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
02/12/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1933. Dep: 23/12/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 833 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
15/06/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1935. Dep: 06/07/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1912 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
30/03/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
28/08/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/08/1937. Dep: 02/10/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 333 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
17/12/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/12/1938. Dep: 24/12/1938. | ||
25/05/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1940. Dep: 08/06/1940. | ||
11/04/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
02/06/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1943. Dep: 26/06/1943. Work undertaken: New left hand cylinder fitted Boiler number 138 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 1301 but not taken up | ||
12/01/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/01/1946. Dep: 02/02/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 722 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
07/07/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1679 | ||
06/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD) | ||
24/08/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
13/09/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/09/1947. Dep: 27/09/1947. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
23/12/1947 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 1679 from Mexborough (MEX) |