Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 1490 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14896 Week
» 67912 Month
» 187439 Year
» 3214292 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1508 |
m/e |
03/1913 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8508 |
m/e |
01/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1942) |
7422 |
m/e |
Not applied |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1508 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
61508 |
m/e |
10/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Holden |
Class |
B12 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
A73 |
To Service |
During 03/1913 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 30/04/1953 |
Service Life |
40 yrs, 2 mths , 1 dy |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1953 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
03/1913 |
KIT |
|
Kittybrewster |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
61C |
|
Keith |
4w/e |
14/06/1952 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
30/04/1953 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
61C |
Keith |
4w/e |
14/06/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
30/04/1953 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
07/1924 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
10/1931 |
ACFI feed water heating apparatus fitted |
08/1941 |
ACFI feed water heating apparatus removed |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/10/1949 |
Inverurie Works |
Locomotives entering Works during October: These included Nos. 61508/24, 62240/60/65, 64466/71, 64500, 4531, 5229, 65279, 68192, ex-L.M.S. 44254, 4324, 15136, 17251, 17359, 17450/51. |
SLS/194912 |
31/01/1950 |
Inverurie Works |
Locomotives entering Works during January: These included Nos. 61508/21, 62273, 4483, 64490, ex-L.M.S. 15144, 15222/66, 56326, 17235/55, 57289. |
SLS/195003 |
31/07/1951 |
G.N.O.S. Section - Keith |
In an afternoon's observation at the Junction B1's 61343/8/52, D41's 62231/56, D40's 62262, 62264/9, and B12/1 61508 were seen. The B1's were in excellent condition. The others were just clean. 62269 has a crest and also a tender cab. 62231 in plain black appeared hauling a director's special, since involved in a crash at Dalguise on 1st August. 61508 was still in green as was 61528 seen at Craigellachie Junction: The Aberdeen-Inverness and a goods were both worked from Keith by Cal. 4-4-0's of 60A. The station was in the process of being repainted. |
SLS/195109 |
31/07/1952 |
Keith MPD |
Engines at Keith shed were 62231, 62225/42/56/65/8/9/72/5, 61502/7/8, 67292, 54473 an 57597. |
SLS/195208 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1913 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1508 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
01/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8508 |
|
|
07/1924 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
10/1931 |
Modification |
Modification: ACFI feed water heating apparatus fitted |
|
|
08/1941 |
Modification |
Modification: ACFI feed water heating apparatus removed |
|
|
1942 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 7422 but not taken up |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1508 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kittybrewster (KIT) |
|
|
10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61508 |
|
|
14/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Keith (61C) |
|
|
30/04/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61508 |
|
|
07/1953 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|