Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 2050 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15456 Week
» 68472 Month
» 187999 Year
» 3214852 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1520 |
m/e |
04/1914 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8520 |
m/e |
01/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1942) |
7434 |
m/e |
Not applied |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1520 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
61520 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Holden |
Class |
B12 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
R75 |
To Service |
During 04/1914 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 24/06/1957 |
Service Life |
43 yrs, 2 mths , 24 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1957 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
04/1914 |
STR |
|
Stratford |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
32A |
|
Norwich Thorpe |
4w/e |
19/03/1955 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
24/06/1957 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
IPS |
Ipswich |
m/e |
03/12/1945 |
ALLOC |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
4w/e |
26/03/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
24/06/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
08/1925 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
04/1932 |
ACFI feed water heating apparatus fitted |
01/1940 |
ACFI feed water heating apparatus removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1914 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1520 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
01/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8520 |
|
|
08/1925 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
04/1932 |
Modification |
Modification: ACFI feed water heating apparatus fitted |
|
|
01/1940 |
Modification |
Modification: ACFI feed water heating apparatus removed |
|
|
1942 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 7434 but not taken up |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1520 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61520 |
|
|
19/03/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
24/06/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61520 |
|
|
09/1957 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|