Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 1334 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19137 Week
» 72153 Month
» 191680 Year
» 3218533 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1538 |
m/e |
07/1915 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8538 |
m/e |
01/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1942) |
7452 |
m/e |
Not applied |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1538 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
61538 |
m/e |
08/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Holden |
Class |
B12 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
B78 |
To Service |
During 07/1915 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 01/01/1957 |
Service Life |
41 yrs, 6 mths , 2 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1957 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
GRA |
Grantham |
w/e |
01/10/1949 |
ALLOC |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
4w/e |
13/08/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
01/01/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
03/1928 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
12/1932 |
ACFI feed water heating apparatus fitted |
06/1937 |
ACFI feed water heating apparatus removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1915 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1538 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
01/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8538 |
|
|
03/1928 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
12/1932 |
Modification |
Modification: ACFI feed water heating apparatus fitted |
|
|
06/1937 |
Modification |
Modification: ACFI feed water heating apparatus removed |
|
|
1942 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 7452 but not taken up |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1538 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
08/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61538 |
|
|
01/10/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) |
|
|
23/07/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C) |
|
|
01/01/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61538 |
|
|
11/1957 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|