Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 2536 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15942 Week
» 68958 Month
» 188485 Year
» 3215338 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1568 |
m/e |
06/1920 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8568 |
m/e |
01/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1942) |
7482 |
m/e |
10/1942 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1568 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
61568 |
m/e |
10/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Holden |
Class |
B12 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
H82 |
To Service |
During 06/1920 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 03/08/1959 |
Service Life |
39 yrs, 2 mths , 3 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1959 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
04/1924 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
10/1931 |
ACFI feed water heating apparatus fitted |
04/1941 |
ACFI feed water heating apparatus removed |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
19/04/1958 |
Cromer MPD |
The allocation at Beach shed is-B12/3, 61514/6/42/7/68 and B1 61312; the latter works usually on the Melton Constable branch and the B12's on Norwich trains. |
SLS/195805 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1920 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1568 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
01/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8568 |
|
|
04/1924 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
10/1931 |
Modification |
Modification: ACFI feed water heating apparatus fitted |
|
|
04/1941 |
Modification |
Modification: ACFI feed water heating apparatus removed |
|
|
10/1942 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7482 |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1568 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61568 |
|
|
19/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
07/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
21/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
25/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yarmouth Beach (32F) |
|
|
24/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D) |
|
|
23/01/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
22/05/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yarmouth Beach (32F) |
|
|
24/07/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
21/08/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
03/08/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61568 |
|
|
09/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|