Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1052 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18855 Week
» 71871 Month
» 191398 Year
» 3218251 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
2803 |
on |
13/12/1928 |
British Railways |
61603 |
4w/e |
22/01/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley / E. Thompson |
Class |
B2 |
Company History |
LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
Works Number |
23806 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
Mon 13/12/1928 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 08/09/1958 |
Service Life |
29 yrs, 8 mths , 26 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1958 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
13/12/1928 |
COL |
|
Colchester |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
31A |
|
Cambridge |
4w/e |
15/12/1956 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
08/09/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
IPS |
Ipswich |
m/e |
28/02/1946 |
ALLOC |
31A |
Cambridge |
3w/e |
01/12/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
08/09/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
13/12/1928 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2803, name: FRAMLINGHAM Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 23806 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Colchester (COL) |
|
|
22/01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61603 |
|
|
15/12/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
09/1958 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
08/09/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61603 |
|
|