Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 296 Today
» 1240 Yesterday
» 2635 Week
» 8769 Month
» 236653 Year
» 1458218 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2828 on 23/03/1931
LNER (1946) 1628 m/e 09/1946
BR 61628 m/e 12/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
23/03/1931 HAREWOOD HOUSE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class B17
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/223/03/1931
B17/612/1948
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Mon 23/03/1931
Withdrawal Mon 15/09/1952
Scrapping During 09/1952
Service Life 21 yrs, 5 mths , 23 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) 23/03/1931
CAM Cambridge 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn 15/09/1952

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CAM Cambridge m/e 03/12/1945
ALLOC ARD Ardsley w/e 01/11/1947
ALLOC HITL Hitchin (GNR) w/e 19/06/1948
WDN HITL Hitchin (GNR) 29/08/1949
WDN   w/e 15/09/1952

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
06/09/1952 G.N. Section The summer service ended without a failure on the 'Capitals' as far as Kings X were concerned, but there were two failures from the Edinburgh end, unfortunately. After an unbroken spell of over five weeks No. 60027 ran hot during week ended 16/8/52, north of York. The scheme by which the Kings X men were to take their own engines did not work out as planned, only five out of eleven weeks being-so worked, the remainder were shared by Nos. 60017/33/34. In fact, of these three, No. 60033 ran over 10,000 miles during one period of four weeks, though even this was probably exceeded by No. 60027 during the first four weeks of the summer service. Ten of the older J52's at Hornsey are to be exchanged for a similar number of J50's from Doncaster and other sheds, in the near future. A J50 was recently tried out on the trip workings from Hornsey to the Southern Region and the transfers are possibly the result of the success of those tests. A Diesel was also tried on these trips, but no more are expected at Hornsey for the time being.
The withdrawal has been announced of B17 61628 Harewood House this being the first of its class to be withdrawn and, incidentally, the first Gresley 3-cylinder class to feel the axe, apart from the A4 which was destroyed by a bomb during the war. No. 61628 was built at Darlington in 1931 as 2828, renumbered 1628 in 9/46 and 61628 in 1/49.
SLS/195211

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
23/03/1931 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2828, name: HAREWOOD HOUSE
Built at Darlington Works
   
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1628    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61628    
15/09/1952 Withdrawn Condemned as 61628    

prev prev