|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
12/02/1948 | Stratford Works (Running Shed) | The following locomotives were seen stripped: Nos. *1518, 2620, 4766, 5391, *7118, *7122, *7148, 7203/18, an 9659, while in the process of being stripped were: Nos. 1623/39/52, 5522, an 8529. The following were in course of erection: Nos. 1046/7, 1609/10/21/31/53/59/61/2/3/6 an 8764; No. 4889 was complete, and No. 1553 was apparently in for examination. Awaiting Works at various points were: Nos. 1509/*44/78, 1624, 2536/63, 2590, 2602, 4663/89, *5360/*80/3, 5400/10/18/52, 5506, *7119/*20. *7130/*1/*2/*5/*6/*7/*44/*7/83, 7219/26/37, *7511/*2, 8168/74, 8213, 8372, *8485/*8/9, 8791/6, 8854 an 9604. *Officially withdrawn. The Paint Shop produced the following all newly painted, lettered 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' in yellow paint and prefixed 'E': Nos. 1056, 4687, 5565, an 8376. No. 8082 was stored here. The first locomotive to have been lettered in the above new style was No. 8619, which in addition was painted green and is now to be seen at Liverpool Street, acting as station pilot. The Running Shed produced the following additional locomotives painted in the new style: Nos. 1045, 1664, an 1667 | SLS/194803 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
15/01/1937 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2864, name: LIVERPOOL Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 4126 |
||
06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1664 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Colwick (CLK) | ||
30/10/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
25/06/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
07/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
03/1950 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 61664 | ||
26/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
23/06/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
29/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
20/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
16/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D) | ||
23/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D) | ||
20/06/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
22/01/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D) | ||
19/03/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
23/07/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D) | ||
20/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
05/09/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D) | ||
07/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C) | ||
16/01/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
06/1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
01/06/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61664 |