Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 327 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14370 Week
» 79324 Month
» 281988 Year
» 3308841 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
2865 |
on |
26/01/1937 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1665 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
61665 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
B17 |
Company History |
LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
Works Number |
4127 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
Thu 26/01/1937 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 16/04/1959 |
Service Life |
22 yrs, 2 mths , 21 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1959 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
04/1942 |
Vacuum Brakes fitted |
04/1942 |
Westinghouse Brake fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/01/1937 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2865, name: LEICESTER CITY Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 4127 |
|
|
04/1942 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Brakes fitted |
|
|
04/1942 |
Modification |
Modification: Westinghouse Brake fitted |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1665 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61665 |
|
|
03/07/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS) |
|
|
10/07/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (YAR) |
|
|
07/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
21/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
16/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D) |
|
|
23/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D) |
|
|
20/06/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
22/01/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D) |
|
|
04/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
16/04/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61665 |
|
|