|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 1910 | 02/1910 | General | ||||
Doncaster Works | 1914 | 11/1914 | General | ||||
Doncaster Works | 1921 | 08/1921 | General | Superheated boiler fitted |
|||
Doncaster Works | 21/09/1922 | 18/11/1922 | 59 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/10/1923 | 23/02/1924 | 125 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3275 |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/10/1924 | 08/11/1924 | 18 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/09/1925 | 12/11/1925 | 60 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/12/1926 | 28/04/1927 | 140 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/06/1927 | 24/08/1927 | 58 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/11/1928 | 02/02/1929 | 69 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/01/1931 | 07/03/1931 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/03/1933 | 22/04/1933 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/04/1935 | 11/05/1935 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/03/1936 | 21/03/1936 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/05/1937 | 19/06/1937 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/06/1940 | 20/07/1940 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/11/1940 | 30/11/1940 | 29 days | Light Repair | After collision |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/11/1942 | 19/12/1942 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/04/1945 | 21/04/1945 | 1 day | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
16/01/1943 | Doncaster Notes (engines lettered 'NE') | No. 2005, converted to Class 'A,' was due out 16/1. Another 'Q.4' 5048 is on hand for conversion to 'Q.1.' Other arrivals for works are 3838, 3465 an 4993. Streamlined 'B.17' 2870 has left works after a 'general,' also 'J.55' 3859 (BFD). Following on the previous list of engines lettered 'NE' at Plant:- October: 2957, 4474, 1125, 4513, 180, 4003, 4663, 4340, 3488, 4266, 2572, 4655, 3497, 1158, 1367, 4471, 1312, 4312, 3350, 4601, 1141, 4377, 2598, 4490, 2859, 2555, 2461, 483, 3076, 4637, 590, 2766, 4834, 4664, 1118, 4888, 2394, 3224, 4594, 4462, November: 3476, 2439, 4871, 4594, 4646, 4008, 2960, 601, 4053, 4805, 2426, 118, 135, 2563, 112, 1300, 4035, 4449, 4246, 4884, 2744, 4843, 3298, 2417, 5961, 178, 4495, 608, 2958, 2579, 2453, 3050, 125, 114, 4853, 3500, 3494, 2593, 3167. December: 3821, 4497, 4414, 4426, 3276, 4824, 586, 4545, 3621, 4018, 4225, 587, 3275 4793, 2546, 4456, 3819, 4851, 4316, 3631, 3819, 599, 3010, 3593, 17, 3387, 6139, 3498, 1156, 2870, 4240, 2955, 3232, 3047. | SLS/194302 |
30/04/1949 | Darlington Works | New work April: Nos. 60146 an 60147. Locomotives awaiting Works during April included: Nos. 888, 1035, 61199, 1224, 1405, 61625, 1668, 2726, 62753. 2760, 3044, 3260, 3275, 63286, 5044/68, 5109, 65633/50, 5653, 65684, 5858, 65868, 7278, 7675, 67729 (light re-pair), 67739 (damaged), 8156, 69842, Class '8' W.D. 77037, 77178 an 79206. Broken up: Nos. 63286, 3316, 65633/84. Locomotives ex Works during April included: Nos. 60816, 61023, 61215/40/57, 61422, 61434 (rebuilt), 61648, 62700/03/64/67, 63348/80/92, 63411, 65110, 65739, 65821/44, 67722 (light repair), 68015/27, 68409/14/32, 68705, 69107, 69391, 69835/36/88, Class '8' W.D. 90382, 90449 (light repair) and 90460. |
SLS/194906 |
31/05/1949 | Darlington Works (scrap yard) | New Work May: Class 'A.1' Nos. 60148 an 60149. No. 60150 was ex the Paint Shop on 14/6, painted green. Locomotives awaiting Works durine May included: Nos. 812, 61069. 1407/15, 61600/61. 62709, 2726/41/56, 5109, 5675, 5784/87, 67317, 7609/19/20, 67708, 67741 (light repair), 8159, 9377, 69824/34/36, Class '8' 79184 an 90001. To scrap yard: Nos. 2377 (frames only), 3275/77, 3300/05/07/34, 65107, 5114, 5602, 65629 an 5703. Locomotives ex Works during May included: Nos. 60955, 61035. 61100 (unlined), 61199, 61224, 62397, 62745/53, 63351/95, 63440, 65040/47/89/92, 65110, 65653/55/59, 65730, 65848, 67319/31, 68061, 69106/11, Class '8' 90662/74. Nos. 60083/86 an 60127 have been noted here painted in the new blue colours with the crest on the tender. | SLS/194907 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1904 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 275 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1033 |
||
1910 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1910. Dep: ?/02/1910. | ||
1914 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1914. Dep: ?/11/1914. | ||
1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1921. Dep: ?/08/1921. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted |
||
21/09/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1922. Dep: 18/11/1922. | ||
22/10/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/10/1923. Dep: 23/02/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3275 |
||
22/10/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/10/1924. Dep: 08/11/1924. | ||
14/09/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1925. Dep: 12/11/1925. | ||
10/12/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1926. Dep: 28/04/1927. | ||
28/06/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/06/1927. Dep: 24/08/1927. | ||
26/11/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1928. Dep: 02/02/1929. | ||
31/01/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1931. Dep: 07/03/1931. | ||
11/03/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1933. Dep: 22/04/1933. | ||
06/04/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1935. Dep: 11/05/1935. | ||
07/03/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/03/1936. Dep: 21/03/1936. | ||
08/05/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1937. Dep: 19/06/1937. | ||
22/06/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1940. Dep: 20/07/1940. | ||
02/11/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/11/1940. Dep: 30/11/1940. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
11/10/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
07/11/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/11/1942. Dep: 19/12/1942. | ||
31/07/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
21/04/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 21/04/1945. Dep: 21/04/1945. | ||
05/05/1945 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3275 | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 2804 but not taken up | ||
21/02/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haverton Hill (HAV) |