05/1904 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 278 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1036 |
|
|
1908 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1908. Dep: ?/05/1908. |
|
|
1911 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1911. Dep: ?/11/1911. |
|
|
1920 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1920. Dep: ?/09/1920. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted
|
|
|
14/11/1922 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1922. Dep: 24/03/1923. |
|
|
02/11/1923 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1923. Dep: 03/05/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3278
|
|
|
02/10/1924 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/10/1924. Dep: 08/11/1924. |
|
|
02/09/1926 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/09/1926. Dep: 22/01/1927. |
|
|
1929 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hitchin (GNR) (HIT ) |
|
|
16/02/1929 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) |
|
|
12/10/1929 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1929. Dep: 23/11/1929. |
|
|
10/05/1930 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/05/1930. Dep: 17/05/1930. |
|
|
20/02/1932 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/02/1932. Dep: 02/04/1932. |
|
|
26/08/1933 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1933. Dep: 14/10/1933. |
|
|
11/01/1936 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1936. Dep: 08/02/1936. |
|
|
12/02/1938 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/02/1938. Dep: 19/03/1938. |
|
|
13/07/1938 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) |
|
|
05/08/1939 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1939. Dep: 21/10/1939. |
|
|
17/05/1941 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 17/05/1941. Dep: 28/06/1941. |
|
|
11/09/1943 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/09/1943. Dep: 09/10/1943. |
|
|
29/12/1943 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) |
|
|
02/09/1944 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/09/1944. Dep: 30/09/1944. |
|
|
07/07/1945 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 07/07/1945. Dep: 07/07/1945. |
|
|
26/07/1945 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3278 |
|
|
1946 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 2807 but not taken up |
|
|