Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 4061 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17467 Week
» 70483 Month
» 190010 Year
» 3216863 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
283 |
|
06/1904 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924 Tmp) |
283N |
|
25/08/1923 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3283 |
|
30/12/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2812 |
|
12/11/1946 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
C1 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-2 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
236 |
Works Number |
1040 |
To Service |
During 06/1904 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 21/08/1947 |
Service Life |
43 yrs, 2 mths , 21 dys |
Notes
Notes |
Carried out Stationery Boiler duties at Doncaster Wagon works until 6/52 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
06/1904 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
21/08/1947 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
GRA |
Grantham |
on |
21/08/1947 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
17/08/1947 |
Doncaster Works |
On 17/8 the following withdrawn locos. (still complete) were in the Works yard: 'D3' 2127/42/47; 'D2' 2171/86/91/96; 'Cl' 2800/12; '03' 3490/92; 'J3' 4155; 'C12' 7396 and Railcars R51909/13; whilst the following: 'D3' 2123, 'D2' 2181 and 'Dl' 2203 were observed stripped. Locos. awaiting Works or scrapping were: 'Bl' 1091, 'D3' 2139, 'D2' 2170/73, 'J3' 4121 and 'J55' 8319. W.D. No. 77003 was noted in the Erecting Shop. |
SLS/194710 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1904 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 283 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1040 |
|
|
1909 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1909. Dep: ?/08/1909. |
|
|
1914 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1914. Dep: ?/04/1914. |
|
|
1916 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1916. Dep: ?/11/1916. |
|
|
07/06/1922 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/06/1922. Dep: 05/08/1922. |
|
|
21/06/1923 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1923. Dep: 25/08/1923. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted Renumbered to LNER (1924 Tmp) number 283N
|
|
|
04/07/1924 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/07/1924. Dep: 30/12/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3283
|
|
|
16/02/1925 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/02/1925. Dep: 05/04/1925. |
|
|
05/07/1926 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/07/1926. Dep: 25/11/1926. |
|
|
03/02/1928 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1928. Dep: 28/04/1928. |
|
|
28/12/1929 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/12/1929. Dep: 08/02/1930. |
|
|
19/12/1931 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/12/1931. Dep: 06/02/1932. |
|
|
04/02/1933 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/02/1933. Dep: 18/03/1933. |
|
|
15/06/1935 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1935. Dep: 20/07/1935. |
|
|
29/05/1937 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/05/1937. Dep: 03/07/1937. |
|
|
05/08/1939 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1939. Dep: 07/10/1939. |
|
|
13/02/1943 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/02/1943. Dep: 27/03/1943. |
|
|
27/10/1945 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1945. Dep: 01/12/1945. |
|
|
12/11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2812 |
|
|
26/07/1947 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 26/07/1947. Dep: 26/07/1947. |
|
|
21/08/1947 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2812 |
|
|