07/1904 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 287 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1045 |
|
|
1909 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1909. Dep: ?/02/1909. |
|
|
1911 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1911. Dep: ?/12/1911. |
|
|
1918 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1918. Dep: ?/11/1918. |
|
|
24/02/1922 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1922. Dep: 24/06/1922. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted
|
|
|
22/08/1922 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/08/1922. Dep: 26/08/1922. |
|
|
26/03/1923 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/03/1923. Dep: 01/09/1923. |
|
|
17/02/1925 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1925. Dep: 23/05/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3287
|
|
|
27/05/1925 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) |
|
|
29/11/1926 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1926. Dep: 12/03/1927. |
|
|
12/03/1927 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) |
|
|
25/05/1929 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1929. Dep: 13/07/1929. |
|
|
12/07/1929 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) |
|
|
22/11/1930 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1930. Dep: 27/12/1930. |
|
|
08/10/1932 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1932. Dep: 03/12/1932. |
|
|
27/01/1934 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1934. Dep: 24/02/1934. |
|
|
18/01/1936 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1936. Dep: 07/03/1936. |
|
|
09/10/1937 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/10/1937. Dep: 06/11/1937. |
|
|
22/10/1938 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/10/1938. Dep: 03/12/1938. |
|
|
09/11/1940 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1940. Dep: 14/12/1940. |
|
|
11/04/1943 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) |
|
|
03/07/1943 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1943. Dep: 14/08/1943. |
|
|
12/02/1945 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) |
|
|
29/09/1945 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 29/09/1945. Dep: 29/09/1945. |
|
|
06/10/1945 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3287 |
|
|
1946 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 2816 but not taken up |
|
|