08/1904 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 288 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1047 |
|
|
1910 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1910. Dep: ?/07/1910. |
|
|
1918 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1918. Dep: ?/03/1918. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted
|
|
|
19/06/1922 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/06/1922. Dep: 29/07/1922. |
|
|
06/05/1924 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/05/1924. Dep: 12/07/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3288
|
|
|
12/07/1924 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hitchin (GNR) (HIT ) |
|
|
21/12/1925 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1925. Dep: 20/03/1926. |
|
|
14/06/1928 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) |
|
|
12/01/1929 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/01/1929. Dep: 23/02/1929. |
|
|
12/07/1930 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/07/1930. Dep: 06/09/1930. |
|
|
09/05/1931 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/05/1931. Dep: 13/06/1931. |
|
|
29/10/1932 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1932. Dep: 26/11/1932. |
|
|
28/04/1934 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1934. Dep: 02/06/1934. |
|
|
06/06/1936 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1936. Dep: 18/07/1936. |
|
|
12/06/1937 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/06/1937. Dep: 03/07/1937. |
|
|
07/05/1938 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1938. Dep: 18/06/1938. |
|
|
16/02/1939 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hitchin (GNR) (HIT ) |
|
|
06/01/1940 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/01/1940. Dep: 10/02/1940. |
|
|
02/10/1943 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/10/1943. Dep: 30/10/1943. |
|
|
17/02/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2817 |
|
|
05/01/1947 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) |
|
|
23/02/1947 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1947. Dep: 30/04/1947. |
|
|
1948 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 62817 but not taken up |
|
|
12/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hitchin (GNR) (HIT ) |
|
|
25/06/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) |
|
|
08/05/1950 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2817 |
|
|