06/1905 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 300 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1075 |
|
|
1910 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1910. Dep: ?/06/1910. |
|
|
1918 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1918. Dep: ?/01/1918. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted
|
|
|
05/07/1921 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/07/1921. Dep: 22/10/1921. |
|
|
19/04/1922 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/04/1922. Dep: 06/05/1922. |
|
|
10/03/1923 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) |
|
|
21/02/1924 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1924. Dep: 24/05/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3300
|
|
|
25/05/1924 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) |
|
|
02/03/1926 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1926. Dep: 03/09/1926. |
|
|
18/07/1927 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1927. Dep: 24/11/1927. |
|
|
13/07/1929 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1929. Dep: 24/08/1929. |
|
|
26/04/1930 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1930. Dep: 24/05/1930. |
|
|
12/03/1932 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1932. Dep: 30/04/1932. |
|
|
03/02/1934 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1934. Dep: 17/03/1934. |
|
|
05/10/1935 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1935. Dep: 09/11/1935. |
|
|
30/04/1938 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1938. Dep: 04/06/1938. |
|
|
08/07/1939 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) |
|
|
20/09/1942 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) |
|
|
12/12/1942 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1942. Dep: 09/01/1943. |
|
|
28/03/1943 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) |
|
|
14/04/1945 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/04/1945. Dep: 28/04/1945. |
|
|
06/04/1946 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1946. Dep: 11/05/1946. |
|
|
11/11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2828 |
|
|
1948 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 62828 but not taken up |
|
|
19/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hitchin (GNR) (HIT ) |
|
|
29/08/1949 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2828 |
|
|