06/1905 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1402 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1078 |
|
|
1909 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1909. Dep: ?/03/1909. |
|
|
1912 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1912. Dep: ?/12/1912. |
|
|
1917 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1917. Dep: ?/08/1917. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted
|
|
|
03/05/1921 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow (General) - Arr: 03/05/1921. Dep: 20/09/1921. |
|
|
31/07/1922 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 31/07/1922. Dep: 26/08/1922. |
|
|
27/01/1923 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 27/01/1923. Dep: 24/03/1923. |
|
|
06/09/1923 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 06/09/1923. Dep: 27/10/1923. |
|
|
03/02/1924 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) |
|
|
07/05/1924 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1924. Dep: 28/06/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4402
|
|
|
16/02/1925 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1925. Dep: 25/04/1925. |
|
|
29/04/1925 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brunswick (LIV) |
|
|
29/01/1926 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/01/1926. Dep: 26/04/1926. |
|
|
14/03/1927 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) |
|
|
02/03/1928 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1928. Dep: 21/06/1928. |
|
|
04/08/1928 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) |
|
|
20/12/1928 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM) |
|
|
22/03/1930 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1930. Dep: 10/05/1930. |
|
|
09/04/1932 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1932. Dep: 14/05/1932. |
|
|
14/10/1932 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/10/1932. Dep: 05/11/1932. |
|
|
27/01/1934 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1934. Dep: 24/02/1934. |
|
|
14/12/1935 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1935. Dep: 18/01/1936. |
|
|
26/06/1937 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1937. Dep: 31/07/1937. |
|
|
04/01/1939 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) |
|
|
18/02/1939 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1939. Dep: 15/04/1939. |
|
|
06/04/1940 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/04/1940. Dep: 27/04/1940. |
|
|
19/07/1941 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/07/1941. Dep: 30/08/1941. |
|
|
24/04/1943 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/04/1943. Dep: 22/05/1943. |
|
|
29/12/1943 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) |
|
|
02/09/1944 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/09/1944. Dep: 07/10/1944. |
|
|
24/02/1945 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/02/1945. Dep: 10/03/1945. |
|
|
22/09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2832 |
|
|
05/08/1947 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2832 |
|
|