06/1905 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1405 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1080 |
|
|
1909 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1909. Dep: ?/06/1909. |
|
|
1913 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1913. Dep: ?/06/1913. |
|
|
1914 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1914. Dep: ?/04/1914. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted
|
|
|
1919 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1919. Dep: ?/07/1919. |
|
|
14/11/1922 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1922. Dep: 17/02/1923. |
|
|
12/10/1923 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 12/10/1923. Dep: 05/01/1924. |
|
|
09/10/1924 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/10/1924. Dep: 24/01/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4405
|
|
|
15/06/1925 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/06/1925. Dep: 15/08/1925. |
|
|
15/02/1926 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/02/1926. Dep: 10/07/1926. |
|
|
30/06/1927 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1927. Dep: 18/10/1927. |
|
|
29/06/1929 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1929. Dep: 10/08/1929. |
|
|
06/06/1931 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1931. Dep: 25/07/1931. |
|
|
21/10/1933 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/10/1933. Dep: 25/11/1933. |
|
|
28/09/1935 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1935. Dep: 26/10/1935. |
|
|
31/10/1935 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/10/1935. Dep: 16/11/1935. |
|
|
12/02/1938 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/02/1938. Dep: 12/03/1938. |
|
|
26/07/1941 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/07/1941. Dep: 13/09/1941. |
|
|
07/08/1943 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/08/1943. Dep: 28/08/1943. Work undertaken: After collision
|
|
|
26/08/1944 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1944. Dep: 23/09/1944. |
|
|
27/03/1946 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/03/1946. Dep: 29/04/1946. |
|
|
16/10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2835 |
|
|
14/08/1947 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2835 |
|
|