Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 3207 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16613 Week
» 69629 Month
» 189156 Year
» 3216009 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1407 |
|
07/1905 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4407 |
|
03/05/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2837 |
|
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
C1 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-2 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
241 |
Works Number |
1083 |
To Service |
During 07/1905 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 06/06/1944 |
Service Life |
38 yrs, 11 mths , 7 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
07/1905 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
06/06/1944 |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1905 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1407 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1083 |
|
|
1915 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1915. Dep: ?/08/1915. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted
|
|
|
22/02/1921 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1921. Dep: 25/06/1921. |
|
|
22/11/1923 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1923. Dep: 03/05/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4407
|
|
|
04/11/1925 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/11/1925. Dep: 05/02/1926. |
|
|
14/04/1927 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1927. Dep: 25/06/1927. |
|
|
18/11/1928 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/11/1928. Dep: 26/01/1929. |
|
|
24/08/1929 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1929. Dep: 09/11/1929. |
|
|
16/11/1931 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1931. Dep: 20/02/1932. |
|
|
20/05/1933 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1933. Dep: 22/07/1933. |
|
|
03/11/1934 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1934. Dep: 08/12/1934. |
|
|
22/08/1936 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/08/1936. Dep: 10/10/1936. |
|
|
22/10/1938 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/10/1938. Dep: 19/11/1938. |
|
|
30/11/1940 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1940. Dep: 30/12/1940. |
|
|
16/05/1942 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1942. Dep: 11/07/1942. |
|
|
11/09/1943 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/09/1943. Dep: 09/10/1943. |
|
|
19/05/1944 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 19/05/1944. Dep: 19/05/1944. |
|
|
06/06/1944 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 4407 |
|
|
1946 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 2837 but not taken up |
|
|