07/1905 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1408 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1084 |
|
|
1915 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1915. Dep: ?/01/1915. |
|
|
1921 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1921. Dep: ?/11/1921. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted
|
|
|
05/10/1922 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1922. Dep: 04/11/1922. |
|
|
12/05/1924 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/05/1924. Dep: 26/08/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4408
|
|
|
26/08/1924 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) |
|
|
26/01/1925 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/01/1925. Dep: 04/04/1925. |
|
|
07/04/1925 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (NWE) |
|
|
15/12/1925 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/12/1925. Dep: 15/01/1926. |
|
|
09/04/1927 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/04/1927. Dep: 23/07/1927. |
|
|
07/01/1928 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM) |
|
|
24/05/1928 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (NWE) |
|
|
15/06/1929 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1929. Dep: 03/08/1929. |
|
|
30/05/1931 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/05/1931. Dep: 11/07/1931. |
|
|
25/06/1932 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/06/1932. Dep: 16/07/1932. |
|
|
14/10/1933 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1933. Dep: 16/12/1933. |
|
|
16/11/1935 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1935. Dep: 14/12/1935. |
|
|
07/05/1938 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1938. Dep: 11/06/1938. |
|
|
14/09/1940 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1940. Dep: 19/10/1940. |
|
|
06/10/1941 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) |
|
|
01/05/1943 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1943. Dep: 29/05/1943. |
|
|
04/11/1944 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/11/1944. Dep: 11/11/1944. |
|
|
14/07/1945 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 14/07/1945. Dep: 14/07/1945. |
|
|
26/07/1945 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 4408 |
|
|
1946 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 2838 but not taken up |
|
|