03/1907 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1422 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1144 |
|
|
1912 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1912. Dep: ?/03/1912. |
|
|
1916 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1916. Dep: ?/11/1916. |
|
|
1919 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1919. Dep: ?/06/1919. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted
|
|
|
06/05/1922 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/05/1922. Dep: 08/07/1922. |
|
|
03/06/1924 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/06/1924. Dep: 18/10/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4422
|
|
|
07/04/1926 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1926. Dep: 27/08/1926. |
|
|
04/05/1927 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1927. Dep: 19/08/1927. |
|
|
20/09/1928 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1928. Dep: 24/11/1928. |
|
|
01/11/1930 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/11/1930. Dep: 13/12/1930. |
|
|
31/12/1931 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1931. Dep: 20/02/1932. |
|
|
18/06/1932 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/06/1932. Dep: 25/06/1932. |
|
|
10/02/1934 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1934. Dep: 17/03/1934. |
|
|
16/05/1936 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1936. Dep: 27/06/1936. |
|
|
13/11/1937 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/11/1937. Dep: 11/12/1937. |
|
|
09/12/1939 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/12/1939. Dep: 27/01/1940. |
|
|
31/01/1942 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1942. Dep: 14/03/1942. |
|
|
01/03/1944 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1944. Dep: 01/04/1944. |
|
|
28/04/1945 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) |
|
|
1946 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 2852 but not taken up |
|
|
07/09/1946 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 07/09/1946. Dep: 07/09/1946. |
|
|
28/09/1946 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 4422 |
|
|