|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 1916 | 07/1916 | General | ||||
Doncaster Works | 08/12/1921 | 25/03/1922 | 108 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/12/1923 | 14/04/1924 | 127 days | General | Superheated boiler fitted Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4426 |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/01/1926 | 27/07/1926 | 184 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/03/1928 | 13/06/1928 | 96 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/11/1929 | 11/01/1930 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/11/1931 | 19/12/1931 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/07/1932 | 27/08/1932 | 57 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/11/1934 | 08/12/1934 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/10/1936 | 28/11/1936 | 29 days | General | Heating connection fitted to front end |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/11/1938 | 24/12/1938 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/10/1942 | 05/12/1942 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/06/1943 | 31/07/1943 | 36 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/01/1944 | 08/01/1944 | 1 day | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
16/01/1943 | Doncaster Notes (engines lettered 'NE') | No. 2005, converted to Class 'A,' was due out 16/1. Another 'Q.4' 5048 is on hand for conversion to 'Q.1.' Other arrivals for works are 3838, 3465 an 4993. Streamlined 'B.17' 2870 has left works after a 'general,' also 'J.55' 3859 (BFD). Following on the previous list of engines lettered 'NE' at Plant:- October: 2957, 4474, 1125, 4513, 180, 4003, 4663, 4340, 3488, 4266, 2572, 4655, 3497, 1158, 1367, 4471, 1312, 4312, 3350, 4601, 1141, 4377, 2598, 4490, 2859, 2555, 2461, 483, 3076, 4637, 590, 2766, 4834, 4664, 1118, 4888, 2394, 3224, 4594, 4462, November: 3476, 2439, 4871, 4594, 4646, 4008, 2960, 601, 4053, 4805, 2426, 118, 135, 2563, 112, 1300, 4035, 4449, 4246, 4884, 2744, 4843, 3298, 2417, 5961, 178, 4495, 608, 2958, 2579, 2453, 3050, 125, 114, 4853, 3500, 3494, 2593, 3167. December: 3821, 4497, 4414, 4426, 3276, 4824, 586, 4545, 3621, 4018, 4225, 587, 3275 4793, 2546, 4456, 3819, 4851, 4316, 3631, 3819, 599, 3010, 3593, 17, 3387, 6139, 3498, 1156, 2870, 4240, 2955, 3232, 3047. | SLS/194302 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1907 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1426 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1151 |
||
1916 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1916. Dep: ?/07/1916. | ||
08/12/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1921. Dep: 25/03/1922. | ||
10/12/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1923. Dep: 14/04/1924. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4426 |
||
14/04/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
25/01/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1926. Dep: 27/07/1926. | ||
10/03/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1928. Dep: 13/06/1928. | ||
30/11/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1929. Dep: 11/01/1930. | ||
07/11/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/11/1931. Dep: 19/12/1931. | ||
02/07/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/07/1932. Dep: 27/08/1932. | ||
10/11/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1934. Dep: 08/12/1934. | ||
31/10/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/10/1936. Dep: 28/11/1936. Work undertaken: Heating connection fitted to front end |
||
19/11/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1938. Dep: 24/12/1938. | ||
24/10/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/10/1942. Dep: 05/12/1942. | ||
26/06/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/06/1943. Dep: 31/07/1943. | ||
08/01/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 08/01/1944. Dep: 08/01/1944. | ||
29/02/1944 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 4426 | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 2856 but not taken up |