Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 535 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18338 Week
» 71354 Month
» 190881 Year
» 3217734 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1521 |
m/e |
06/1901 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4521 |
m/e |
10/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7376 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
67376 |
m/e |
06/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
C12 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-2T |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
223 |
Works Number |
924 |
To Service |
During 06/1901 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 22/05/1958 |
Service Life |
56 yrs, 11 mths , 21 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 06/1958 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
06/1901 |
HSY |
|
Hornsey |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
35A |
|
New England |
4w/e |
20/01/1951 |
35A |
|
New England |
m/e |
31/01/1951 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
22/05/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
35A |
New England |
m/e |
31/01/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
22/05/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
08/1923 |
Condensers removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1901 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1521 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 924 |
|
|
08/1923 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
10/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4521 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7376 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hornsey (HSY) |
|
|
06/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67376 |
|
|
20/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
31/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
22/05/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67376 |
|
|
06/1958 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|