Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1913 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15319 Week
» 68335 Month
» 187862 Year
» 3214715 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1525 |
m/e |
08/1901 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4525 |
m/e |
01/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7379 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
67379 |
m/e |
11/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
C12 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-2T |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
223 |
Works Number |
928 |
To Service |
During 08/1901 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 10/06/1958 |
Service Life |
56 yrs, 10 mths , 10 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 06/1958 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
08/1901 |
LTH |
|
Louth |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
35C |
|
Spital Bridge |
3w/e |
12/11/1955 |
35A |
|
New England |
5w/e |
17/12/1955 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
10/06/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
4w/e |
05/11/1955 |
ALLOC |
35A |
New England |
4w/e |
03/12/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
10/06/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
12/1923 |
Condensers removed |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/10/1949 |
Doncaster Works |
Locomotives noted in the Paint Shop at the beginning of November included: Nos. 60030/91, 60109/11, 60891, 60900/38/40, 61208, 61819/91, 61906/53/87, 67379, 69527/47. No. 67387 has been fitted for 'Pull and Push' working. |
SLS/194912 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1901 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1525 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 928 |
|
|
12/1923 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
01/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4525 |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7379 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Louth (LTH) |
|
|
11/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67379 |
|
|
12/11/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C) |
|
|
17/12/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
06/1958 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
10/06/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67379 |
|
|