Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2104 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15510 Week
» 68526 Month
» 188053 Year
» 3214906 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
52 |
m/e |
04/1911 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2203 |
m/e |
01/1947 |
British Railways |
62203 |
m/e |
03/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
D1 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
265 |
Works Number |
1297 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 04/1911 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 31/08/1950 |
Service Life |
39 yrs , 5 mths |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1951 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
04/1911 |
NOR |
|
Norwich Thorpe |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
CLK |
|
Colwick |
w/e |
12/11/1949 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
31/08/1950 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
CLK |
Colwick |
w/e |
12/11/1949 |
WDN |
38A |
Colwick |
on |
31/08/1950 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
08/1926 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
08/1926 |
Westinghouse Brake fitted |
03/1937 |
Vacuum Brakes fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
17/08/1947 |
Doncaster Works |
On 17/8 the following withdrawn locos. (still complete) were in the Works yard: 'D3' 2127/42/47; 'D2' 2171/86/91/96; 'Cl' 2800/12; '03' 3490/92; 'J3' 4155; 'C12' 7396 and Railcars R51909/13; whilst the following: 'D3' 2123, 'D2' 2181 and 'Dl' 2203 were observed stripped. Locos. awaiting Works or scrapping were: 'Bl' 1091, 'D3' 2139, 'D2' 2170/73, 'J3' 4121 and 'J55' 8319. W.D. No. 77003 was noted in the Erecting Shop. |
SLS/194710 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1911 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 52 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1297 |
|
|
08/1926 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
08/1926 |
Modification |
Modification: Westinghouse Brake fitted |
|
|
03/1937 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Brakes fitted |
|
|
01/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2203 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
03/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62203 |
|
|
12/11/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) |
|
|
31/08/1950 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62203 |
|
|
02/1951 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|