Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1409 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19212 Week
» 72228 Month
» 191755 Year
» 3218608 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1383 |
m/e |
12/1900 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4383 |
m/e |
11/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2181 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
62181 |
m/e |
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
D2 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
221 |
Works Number |
914 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 12/1900 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 25/11/1950 |
Service Life |
49 yrs, 11 mths , 26 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1900 |
BOS |
|
Boston |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
25/11/1950 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
on |
20/11/1950 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
17/08/1947 |
Doncaster Works |
On 17/8 the following withdrawn locos. (still complete) were in the Works yard: 'D3' 2127/42/47; 'D2' 2171/86/91/96; 'Cl' 2800/12; '03' 3490/92; 'J3' 4155; 'C12' 7396 and Railcars R51909/13; whilst the following: 'D3' 2123, 'D2' 2181 and 'Dl' 2203 were observed stripped. Locos. awaiting Works or scrapping were: 'Bl' 1091, 'D3' 2139, 'D2' 2170/73, 'J3' 4121 and 'J55' 8319. W.D. No. 77003 was noted in the Erecting Shop. |
SLS/194710 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1900 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1383 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 914 |
|
|
11/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4383 |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2181 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Boston (BOS) |
|
|
1949 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 62181 but not taken up |
|
|
25/11/1950 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2181 |
|
|