Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 30 Online
» 4421 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 20033 Week
» 118678 Month
» 321342 Year
» 3348195 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
6385 |
m/e |
09/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2678 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
62678 |
m/e |
05/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Robinson |
Class |
Large/Scottish Director |
Company History |
GCR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Kitson |
Works Number |
5386 |
To Service |
During 09/1924 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 03/03/1959 |
Service Life |
34 yrs, 6 mths , 0 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
09/1924 |
HAY |
|
Haymarket |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
62A |
|
Thornton Junction |
4w/e |
11/05/1957 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
03/03/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
4w/e |
18/05/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
03/03/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
06/1945 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1924 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 6385, name: LUCKIE MUCKLEBACKIT Built at Kitson, Works Number 5386 |
|
|
06/1945 |
Modification |
Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2678 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Haymarket (HAY) |
|
|
05/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62678 |
|
|
11/05/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A) |
|
|
03/03/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62678 |
|
|
02/1960 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Arnott Young: Old Kilpatrick |
|
|