Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 788 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14194 Week
» 67210 Month
» 186737 Year
» 3213590 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1871 |
m/e |
03/1902 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8871 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1942) |
7741 |
y/e |
Not applied |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2522 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
62522 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
D14 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
F53 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 03/1902 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 04/08/1958 off Cambridge (31A) |
Service Life |
56 yrs, 5 mths , 6 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1958 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
31C |
Kings Lynn |
4w/e |
28/01/1956 |
ALLOC |
31A |
Cambridge |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
04/08/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
04/1924 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
04/1924 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 27 boiler fitted |
04/1924 |
Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted (Belpaire firebox) |
07/1929 |
Extended Smokebox fitted |
06/1936 |
GNR style Chimney fitted |
05/1938 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
05/1938 |
Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted (Round Top firebox) |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1902 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1871 Built at Stratford Works Diagram 28 boiler fitted |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8871 |
|
|
04/1924 |
Modification |
Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted |
|
|
04/1924 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 27 boiler fitted |
|
|
04/1924 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
07/1929 |
Modification |
Modification: Extended Smokebox fitted |
|
|
06/1936 |
Modification |
Modification: GNR style Chimney fitted |
|
|
05/1938 |
Modification |
Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted |
|
|
05/1938 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
|
|
1942 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 7741 but not taken up |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2522 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62522 |
|
|
21/01/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C) |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
04/08/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62522 from Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
10/1958 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|