Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1767 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15173 Week
» 68189 Month
» 187716 Year
» 3214569 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1840 |
m/e |
11/1906 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8840 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1942) |
7710 |
y/e |
Not applied |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2551 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
62551 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
D15 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
G61 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 11/1906 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 16/07/1956 off Spital Bridge (35C) |
Service Life |
49 yrs, 8 mths , 15 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
08/1923 |
Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted (Belpaire firebox) |
02/1929 |
Extended Smokebox fitted |
02/1929 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
03/1935 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted |
03/1935 |
Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted (Round Top firebox) |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1906 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1840 Built at Stratford Works Diagram 28 boiler fitted |
|
|
08/1923 |
Modification |
Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8840 |
|
|
02/1929 |
Modification |
Modification: Extended Smokebox fitted |
|
|
02/1929 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
03/1935 |
Modification |
Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted |
|
|
03/1935 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted |
|
|
1942 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 7710 but not taken up |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2551 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM) |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62551 |
|
|
08/10/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Lynn (KL) |
|
|
15/10/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM) |
|
|
17/05/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C) |
|
|
14/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
21/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
09/08/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C) |
|
|
23/08/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C) |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
15/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
23/01/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C) |
|
|
16/07/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62551 from Spital Bridge (35C) |
|
|