Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 3898 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17304 Week
» 70320 Month
» 189847 Year
» 3216700 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1806 |
m/e |
09/1910 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8806 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1942) |
7673 |
y/e |
Not applied |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2597 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
62597 |
m/e |
01/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
D15 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
P67 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 09/1910 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 04/01/1960 off Kirkby in Ashfield (16B) |
Service Life |
49 yrs, 4 mths , 4 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1960 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
08/1929 |
Extended Smokebox fitted |
08/1929 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
08/1929 |
Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted (Belpaire firebox) |
06/1936 |
GNR style Chimney fitted |
01/1940 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
01/1940 |
Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted (Round Top firebox) |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/05/1959 |
Peterborough Spital Bridge MPD |
. D16s have been re-transferred to Spital Bridge (former MR shed) and are on passenger turns to Northampton and Leicester-62597 an 62612/3 have been so noted. |
SLS/195907 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1910 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1806 Built at Stratford Works Diagram 28 boiler fitted |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8806 |
|
|
08/1929 |
Modification |
Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted |
|
|
08/1929 |
Modification |
Modification: Extended Smokebox fitted |
|
|
08/1929 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
06/1936 |
Modification |
Modification: GNR style Chimney fitted |
|
|
01/1940 |
Modification |
Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted |
|
|
01/1940 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
|
|
1942 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 7673 but not taken up |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2597 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Yarmouth South Town (YAR) |
|
|
01/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62597 |
|
|
20/10/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yarmouth Beach (32F) |
|
|
18/05/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Melton Constable (32G) |
|
|
07/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
18/04/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Spital Bridge (31F) |
|
|
01/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
04/01/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62597 from Kirkby in Ashfield (16B) |
|
|