08/1911 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1798 Built at Stratford Works Diagram 28 boiler fitted |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8798 |
|
|
06/1927 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
04/1932 |
Modification |
Modification: Extended Smokebox fitted |
|
|
04/1932 |
Modification |
Modification: GNR style Chimney fitted |
|
|
04/1934 |
Modification |
Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted |
|
|
04/1934 |
Modification |
Modification: 8" Piston Valves fitted |
|
|
04/1934 |
Modification |
Modification: Decorative Valance over driving wheels removed |
|
|
04/1934 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted |
|
|
1942 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 7668 but not taken up |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2609 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Colchester (COL) |
|
|
04/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62609 |
|
|
31/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M) |
|
|
17/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F) |
|
|
30/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) |
|
|
07/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) |
|
|
17/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) |
|
|
14/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
21/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
12/07/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to South Lynn (31D) |
|
|
19/07/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to South Lynn (31D) |
|
|
04/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
18/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C) |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C) |
|
|
19/09/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
19/12/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C) |
|
|
02/1957 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
04/02/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62609 from Kirkby in Ashfield (16B) |
|
|