Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 1879 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 15922 Week
» 80876 Month
» 283540 Year
» 3310393 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great North of Scotland Railway |
114 |
m/e |
10/1899 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
6914 |
m/e |
11/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2263 |
m/e |
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Pickersgill / T. Heywood |
Class |
D40 |
Company History |
GNSR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
Order Number |
E827 |
Works Number |
5603 |
To Service |
During 10/1899 |
Withdrawal |
During 03/1946 |
Service Life |
46 yrs, 4 mths , 29 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1899 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
03/1946 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
UNK |
|
on |
16/03/1946 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/03/1946 |
First D40 withdrawn |
6914 was the first locomotive of its class to be withdrawn, |
SLS/194605 |
15/04/1946 |
Midland Section |
4825 has been fitted with a self-cleaning smoke-box (15/4). 2683 (26A) was noted at Wellingborough, running light, on 20/3. An interesting working for which Bedford shed is responsible is a trip to Gloucester. The route is via Northampton and Stratford, and the locomotive, usually a 3F, is due out at 3 a.m, and does not re-turn until late at night. |
SLS/194605 |
24/03/1946 |
Renumbering |
Engines passing through shops, whose new numbers are blank, are now being renumbered automatically. It is now confirmed that the first new A2 will be 200. The 'Clauds' which were re-numbered in the 76XX and 77XX during the short-lived 1942 renumbering are now receiving their new numbers. Presumably the L1's, originally allotted the numbers 9000 upwards, are to receive numbers in this series. This change will be necessary if the rate of construction of L1's exceeds the rate of withdrawal of the engines whose new numbers commence at 9050. Likewise, provision is now being made for new B1's to be built into the 13XX before the locomotives' allotted numbers in that series have been withdrawn. Apparently the numbers 1673-99 are to be used for this purpose, and the B5's 5186/7, which were renumbered 1311/2 early in the scheme, have been renumbered a second time to 1689/90. The following errata should be noted in the L.N.E.R. Locomotive Re-numbering Supplement to the Journal: 1507-80, 8512 is now 7426, 3629-31 were 6554-6, 3638 was 6375, 5266/7 were 9357/8, 5450-69 were 7552-71. 8767-82 were 3965-80. 9785-9 were 1190-3/5. 9883-6 were 1524-7. Mr. W. H, Whitworth writes:-I have been through the L.N.E.R. renumbering pamphlet And have found the following errors:-Section. 3600-3639. 1 out somewhere. 5160-6209, should be 5160-5209. 5240-5269. 8357/8 should be 9357/8. 5450-5589, should be 5450-5571. 8757-8889, „ „ 8757-8875. 9050-9069, „ „ 9050-9073. 9770-9799 „ „4 9770-9795. 9850-9889, „ „ 985Q-9887. There may be other mistakes, but these are the ones I have been able to spot: It must have been a huge job to get all the data into such a small space. |
SLS/194605 |
31/03/1946 |
First D40 withdrawn |
6914 was the first locomotive of its class to be withdrawn, |
SLS/194605 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1899 |
To Service |
To service as Great North of Scotland Railway Number 114 Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 5603 |
|
|
11/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 6914 |
|
|
1946 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 2263 but not taken up |
|
|
03/1946 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6914 |
|
|