Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 1024 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18827 Week
» 71843 Month
» 191370 Year
» 3218223 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great North of Scotland Railway |
115 |
m/e |
10/1899 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
6915 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2264 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
62264 |
w/e |
17/04/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Pickersgill / T. Heywood |
Class |
D40 |
Company History |
GNSR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
Order Number |
E827 |
Works Number |
5604 |
To Service |
During 10/1899 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 05/03/1957 |
Service Life |
57 yrs, 5 mths , 3 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1957 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1899 |
KEI |
|
Keith |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
05/03/1957 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
on |
05/03/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/07/1951 |
G.N.O.S. Section - Keith |
In an afternoon's observation at the Junction B1's 61343/8/52, D41's 62231/56, D40's 62262, 62264/9, and B12/1 61508 were seen. The B1's were in excellent condition. The others were just clean. 62269 has a crest and also a tender cab. 62231 in plain black appeared hauling a director's special, since involved in a crash at Dalguise on 1st August. 61508 was still in green as was 61528 seen at Craigellachie Junction: The Aberdeen-Inverness and a goods were both worked from Keith by Cal. 4-4-0's of 60A. The station was in the process of being repainted. |
SLS/195109 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1899 |
To Service |
To service as Great North of Scotland Railway Number 115 Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 5604 |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 6915 |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2264 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Keith (KEI) |
|
|
17/04/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62264 |
|
|
05/03/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62264 |
|
|
07/1957 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|