Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1682 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15088 Week
» 68104 Month
» 187631 Year
» 3214484 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1942) |
7792 |
|
Not applied |
Great Eastern Railway |
1251 |
m/e |
06/1902 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7408 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2793 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
62793 |
m/e |
10/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
E4 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-4-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
S50 |
To Service |
During 06/1902 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 28/02/1955 |
Service Life |
52 yrs, 8 mths , 28 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1955 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
06/1902 |
PEN |
|
|
S |
01/1936 |
NOR |
|
Norwich Thorpe |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
28/02/1955 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
LOW |
Lowestoft |
w/e |
26/10/1946 |
ALLOC |
LOW |
Lowestoft |
on |
20/02/1947 |
ALLOC |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
on |
13/05/1947 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
28/02/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/12/1942 |
L.N.E.R. Notes (March Area) |
March Area.-'V.2's' appear quite often, the following having been noted in Oct./Nov.: 4772/96, 4813/7. 'J.17' 8195 has been fitted with carriage heating and vacuum brake. 2859 East Anglian was here 31/10/42 fresh from Plant. It has ordinary whistle. A 'Pacific' visits us regularly on Sundays, examples noted being 4472/4 an 2571. 'E.4's' 7408/16/66/92 an 7503 are stationed here for working on the Joint line to Spalding, &c.-the first ones shedded here for a long time. Our regular station pilot 8062 is often in shops and its place is taken by 'D.16' 8805 or by 'D.9' or 'J.15' classes. |
SLS/194302 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
0000 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 7792 but not taken up |
|
|
06/1902 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1251 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7408 |
|
|
01/1936 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2793 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62793 |
|
|
28/02/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62793 |
|
|
08/1955 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|