Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 302 Today
» 896 Yesterday
» 4430 Week
» 28391 Month
» 191445 Year
» 268032 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER 1079   01/1894
LNER (1924) 8079 y/e 1924
LNER (1946) 7127 y/e 05/1946
BR 67127 y/e 01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Holden
Class F3
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
F301/1894
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number O33
To Service During 01/1894
Withdrawal Wed 08/04/1953 off Ipswich (32B)
Service Life 59 yrs, 3 mths , 8 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NOR Norwich Thorpe 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
32C Lowestoft 4w/e 23/09/1950
32B Ipswich 5w/e 17/01/1953
   Withdrawn 08/04/1953

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC YB Yarmouth Beach 26/02/1947
ALLOC NOR Norwich Thorpe 12/04/1947
ALLOC LOW Lowestoft w/e 06/12/1947
ALLOC NOR Norwich Thorpe w/e 27/12/1947
ALLOC IPS Ipswich 4w/e 26/03/1949
ALLOC 32C Lowestoft w/e 27/08/1950
ALLOC 32B Ipswich 4w/e 24/01/1953
WDN   08/04/1953

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1905 Saturated LNER Diagram 32 Boiler Fitted
09/1928 Vacuum Ejector fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1894 To Service To service as GER Number 1079
Built at Stratford Works
   
12/1905 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 32 Boiler Fitted    
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8079    
09/1928 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7127    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Norwich Thorpe (NOR)    
01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 67127    
23/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C)    
17/01/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
08/04/1953 Withdrawn Condemned as 67127 from Ipswich (32B)    

prev prev