Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 2306 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20109 Week
» 73125 Month
» 192652 Year
» 3219505 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
783 |
m/e |
11/1904 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7783 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7196 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
67196 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
F4 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
D58 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 11/1904 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 07/03/1955 |
Service Life |
50 yrs, 4 mths , 4 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
11/1904 |
STR |
|
Stratford |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
COL |
|
Colchester |
w/e |
24/01/1948 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
07/03/1955 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
STR |
Stratford |
on |
07/12/1946 |
ALLOC |
COL |
Colchester |
on |
08/02/1947 |
ALLOC |
STR |
Stratford |
on |
24/05/1947 |
ALLOC |
COL |
Colchester |
w/e |
24/01/1948 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
07/03/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1904 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 783 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7783 |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7196 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
24/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (COL) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67196 |
|
|
07/03/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67196 |
|
|