Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 599 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14005 Week
» 67021 Month
» 186548 Year
» 3213401 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
180 |
m/e |
11/1908 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7180 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7174 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
British Railways |
67174 |
m/e |
11/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
F4 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
A65 |
Fittings (as built) |
Condenser | Fitted | Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 11/1908 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 13/12/1954 |
Service Life |
46 yrs, 1 mth , 12 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1955 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1908 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 180 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7180 |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7174 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
24/07/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lowestoft (LOW) |
|
|
25/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
03/09/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (YAR) |
|
|
01/10/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lowestoft (LOW) |
|
|
11/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67174 |
|
|
30/11/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (YAR) |
|
|
17/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (YAR) |
|
|
31/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C) |
|
|
30/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C) |
|
|
13/12/1954 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67174 |
|
|
08/1955 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|