|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/03/1952 | Locomotives still carrying old numbers (LNER) | Engines running with L.N.E. Numbers. (March 1952) 1423, 1879, 2364, 2372, 2395, 2620, 2654, 2659, 3573, 3585, 3647, 3913, 4114, 4117, 4140, 4368, 4642, 5177, 5213, 5297, 5331, 5343, 5565, 7461, 7465, 7470, 7471, 7488, 7500, 7604, 7606, 7625, 8000/1, 8091/6, 8103/8/9/10/21/24/30/31/34-38, 8142/3/5/9, 8154/7, 8161/8, 8173/6/7/8, 8249, 8298, 8316, 8343/54, 8405/94, 8504/14/25/68, 8619/64, 8788/95, 8915/74/79, 9143, 9271/73, 9322, 9707. Uncertain: 851, 6480/1, 9290, 9920 (? done and not reported). | SLS/195206 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1914 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 585 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1445 |
||
09/1925 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3585 | ||
01/1941 | Modification | Modification: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge | ||
12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4234 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Hornsey (HSY) | ||
10/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 64234 | ||
24/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
31/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
12/1959 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
19/12/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64234 |