Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 739 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14145 Week
» 67161 Month
» 186688 Year
» 3213541 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
604 |
m/e |
02/1919 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3604 |
m/e |
09/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4253 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
64253 |
m/e |
08/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt / N. Gresley |
Class |
J6 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
285 |
Works Number |
1485 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 02/1919 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 14/05/1962 |
Service Life |
43 yrs, 3 mths , 13 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1962 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
02/1919 |
CLK |
|
Colwick |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
34B |
|
Hornsey |
4w/e |
24/10/1953 |
34E |
|
New England |
w/e |
27/02/1960 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
14/05/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
34B |
Hornsey |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
ALLOC |
34E |
New England |
4w/e |
19/03/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
14/05/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
11/1940 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1919 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 604 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1485 |
|
|
09/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3604 |
|
|
11/1940 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4253 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Colwick (CLK) |
|
|
08/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64253 |
|
|
24/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hornsey (34B) |
|
|
27/02/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (34E) |
|
|
05/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
14/05/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64253 |
|
|