Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 996 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18799 Week
» 71815 Month
» 191342 Year
» 3218195 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
638 |
m/e |
08/1922 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3638 |
m/e |
06/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4277 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
64277 |
m/e |
03/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt / N. Gresley |
Class |
J6 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
291 |
Works Number |
1541 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 08/1922 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 20/06/1962 |
Service Life |
39 yrs, 10 mths , 20 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 06/1962 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
40F |
Boston |
w/e |
26/05/1951 |
ALLOC |
37B |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
4w/e |
22/03/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
20/06/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
10/1939 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1922 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 638 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1541 |
|
|
06/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3638 |
|
|
10/1939 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4277 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ardsley (ARD) |
|
|
03/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64277 |
|
|
26/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Boston (40F) |
|
|
23/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Boston (40F) |
|
|
22/03/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (37B) |
|
|
06/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
20/06/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64277 |
|
|