Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 1626 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15032 Week
» 68048 Month
» 187575 Year
» 3214428 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
1010 |
m/e |
05/1902 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
6010 |
m/e |
11/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4317 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
64317 |
m/e |
10/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Robinson |
Class |
J11 |
Company History |
GCR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
6072 |
To Service |
During 05/1902 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 15/03/1961 |
Service Life |
58 yrs, 10 mths , 13 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
02/1916 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1902 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 1010 Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 6072 |
|
|
02/1916 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
11/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 6010 |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4317 |
|
|
05/01/1947 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) |
|
|
17/04/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV) |
|
|
10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64317 |
|
|
20/08/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Annesley (38B) |
|
|
12/11/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
17/12/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (39A) |
|
|
08/02/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E) |
|
|
15/03/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64317 |
|
|