Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2045 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19848 Week
» 72864 Month
» 192391 Year
» 3219244 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway (1st) |
907 |
m/e |
10/1891 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7907 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5402 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
65402 |
m/e |
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Worsdell |
Class |
J15 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
N28 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 10/1891 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 25/11/1950 |
Service Life |
59 yrs, 1 mth , 26 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1947 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1891 |
STR |
|
Stratford |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
COL |
|
Colchester |
w/e |
28/02/1948 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
25/11/1950 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
COL |
Colchester |
w/e |
28/02/1948 |
WDN |
30E |
Colchester |
on |
23/10/1950 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
25/09/1947 |
Stratford Works |
The following withdrawn locos. were noted in the vicinity of the stripping shop on 25/9: 'F3' 7118/21/29/38/45; 'B12/3' 1522; 'D16/3' 2500; 'J15' 5358 an 5403 (all stripped), whilst 7125 an 7148 were intact. Other locos. stripped were: 'J15' 5402/54; 'D16' 2535; 'J17' 5541/71. In the stripping shop were: 'E4' 2784; 'J15' 5472; 'J19/2' 4675 and 'J17' 5549. In the Paint shop were the 'Coffee Pot' 'Y5' 8081 and W.D. 77416. A curious sight was the crane tank shed filled by two W.D.'s 77119 an 77312 (the latter with a 15A shed plate). In the fields behind the New Works were 'F3' 7146; 'J70' 8225; 'H2' 7512; 'D16' 2591; 'B12' 1544 and 'J39' 4841, all awaiting works. W.D. 77476 was in the New Works, and W.D.'s 77302 and 77107 were in the shed yard. 'D16' 2584; 'J20' 4677/93; 'J39' 4708/61, 'J69' 8574/8632; 'F6' 7230 and 'F4' 7162 were all noted newly painted ex-works. 7162 was fitted with a tablet-catcher. |
SLS/194711 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1891 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 907 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7907 |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5402 |
|
|
09/1947 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
28/02/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (COL) |
|
|
1949 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 65402 but not taken up |
|
|
25/11/1950 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5402 |
|
|