Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 455 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18258 Week
» 71274 Month
» 190801 Year
» 3217654 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway (1st) |
932 |
m/e |
01/1892 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7932 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5420 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
65420 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Worsdell |
Class |
J15 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
S28 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 01/1892 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 01/08/1962 |
Service Life |
70 yrs, 7 mths , 1 dy |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
BSE |
Bury St Edmunds |
on |
13/06/1947 |
ALLOC |
31B |
March |
4w/e |
13/07/1957 |
ALLOC |
34E |
New England |
5w/e |
13/05/1961 |
ALLOC |
31B |
March |
5w/e |
09/12/1961 |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
2w/e |
23/06/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
01/08/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1892 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 932 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7932 |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5420 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bury St Edmunds (BSE) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65420 |
|
|
20/07/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
06/05/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (34E) |
|
|
18/11/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
23/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
01/08/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65420 |
|
|
04/1963 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|