Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 345 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18148 Week
» 71164 Month
» 190691 Year
» 3217544 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway (1st) |
648 |
m/e |
09/1899 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7648 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5448 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
65448 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Worsdell |
Class |
J15 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
X45 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 09/1899 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 07/03/1960 |
Service Life |
60 yrs, 6 mths , 5 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1960 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
09/1899 |
COL |
|
Colchester |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
30A |
|
Stratford |
w/e |
12/12/1959 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
07/03/1960 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
STR |
Stratford |
on |
02/05/1947 |
ALLOC |
COL |
Colchester |
on |
10/05/1947 |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
4w/e |
26/12/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
07/03/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
by 11/1931 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1899 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 648 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7648 |
|
|
11/1931 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5448 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Colchester (COL) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65448 |
|
|
12/12/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
07/03/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65448 |
|
|
04/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|