Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 935 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18738 Week
» 71754 Month
» 191281 Year
» 3218134 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1179 |
m/e |
10/1901 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8179 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5529 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
65529 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J16 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
L52 |
To Service |
During 10/1901 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 12/05/1958 |
Service Life |
56 yrs, 7 mths , 12 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
CAM |
Cambridge |
w/e |
08/10/1949 |
ALLOC |
31C |
Kings Lynn |
4w/e |
29/11/1952 |
ALLOC |
31B |
March |
4w/e |
19/06/1954 |
ALLOC |
31C |
Kings Lynn |
4w/e |
31/12/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
12/05/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1901 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1179 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8179 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5529 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kings Lynn (KL) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65529 |
|
|
08/10/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM) |
|
|
15/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C) |
|
|
29/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C) |
|
|
19/06/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
17/12/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C) |
|
|
12/05/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65529 |
|
|