Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 2878 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16284 Week
» 69300 Month
» 188827 Year
» 3215680 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1190 |
m/e |
09/1902 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8190 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5540 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
65540 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J16 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
B54 |
To Service |
During 09/1902 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 13/04/1959 |
Service Life |
56 yrs, 7 mths , 13 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
09/1902 |
STR |
|
Stratford |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
31A |
|
Cambridge |
w/e |
14/02/1959 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
13/04/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
31A |
Cambridge |
4w/e |
21/02/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
13/04/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1902 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1190 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8190 |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5540 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65540 |
|
|
14/02/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
13/04/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65540 |
|
|